open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11321
    Party Name:Spyridoula Fontaine
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Terminate Document]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119405
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =