open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00475
    Party Name:Sinotte v. Verizon New England, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47448
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =