open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00474
    Party Name:Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Lima et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service as to USA]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Attorney]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit in Support]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47445
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =