open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11435
    Party Name:Arthur Benoit, Jr. and Claire Benoit
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Close Bankruptcy Case (Autoclose)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119525
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =