open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00595
    Party Name:Kiel James Patrick, LLC et al v. Feishuang et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alternative Service]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47917
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =