open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00594
    Party Name:Turner v. Teknor Apex Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47916
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =