open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11745
    Party Name:Arlene F. LaBua and Raymond H. LaBua, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Creditor List Upload (original list of creditors)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice to Redact]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119840
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =