open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11744
    Party Name:Richard D. Geldard
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Corrective Action Required]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Extend Time]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Duplicate Filer]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119839
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =