open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00597
    Party Name:Doe v. United States Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:July 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Proceed under a Pseudonym]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Under a Pseudonym]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47924
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =