open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11826
    Party Name:Maria M Lopez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Close Bankruptcy Case (Autoclose)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Addendum]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Avoid Lien (for Chs. 7, 11 and 12 only)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119921
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =