open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11827
    Party Name:Michele A. Marsella
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Terminate Document]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Generic Application]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Response]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Consent]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Generic Application/Motion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119923
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =