open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11829
    Party Name:Charles P. Francisco
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119925
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =