open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00028
    Party Name:Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc. v. HDI Global Specialty SE
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal - New Case]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48313
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =