open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00029
    Party Name:Baird et al v. Terra et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48314
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =