open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00080
    Party Name:Lupo v. Prinscott, M.D. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48448
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =