open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-bk-10180
    Party Name:Esther A. Dube
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Close Bankruptcy Case (Autoclose)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Trustee Document]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?120246
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =