open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00081
    Party Name:Martineau v. Life Insurance Company of North America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48489
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =