open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:20-bk-10876
    Party Name:Miguel D. Dominguez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Trustee Document]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Corrective Action Required]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-2 Means Test Calculation]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Form 122A-2 Means Test Calculation]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?120951
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =