U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.