U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Skoly v. McKee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Request]
  • September 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Entering Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Corrective Docket Entry]
  • February 18, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • February 07, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.