U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Youngs v. Party People, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Request]
  • December 01, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • September 16, 2022: [Rule 16 Statement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 08, 2022: [Corrective Docket Entry]
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Request]
  • February 08, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.