U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Finnimore & Fisher, Inc. v. Town of New Shoreham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • February 10, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • February 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.