U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Odoom et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corrective Docket Entry]
  • April 23, 2025: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.