U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00456
  • Case Name: Jones v. Providence Public Schools
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply Memorandum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter sent to Effectuate Service (Form Attached)]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Exhibit in Support]
  • December 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.