U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Noel v. United Better Homes, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • May 08, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 02, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript Order Rescinded]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2023: [Public Docket Note]
  • January 17, 2023: [Exhibit in Support]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.