U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10457
  • Case Name: Kenneth Robert Boyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice of Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Notice of Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Notice of Inactivity]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.