U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10389
  • Case Name: Derick V. Ferreira
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Suspend Plan Payments]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Consent]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Suspend Plan Payments]
October, 2024
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Wages]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.