U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10076
  • Case Name: Raymond J Pezzullo, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Employ]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Hearing Not Held]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Terminate Trustee & Add Trustee]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice of Appointment of Successor Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Requesting Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Status Report- Bankruptcy]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Notice of Inactivity]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.