U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10647
  • Case Name: Randy Arenas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Conditional Order]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Approve Compromise]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Approve Compromise 9019/Compromise Controversy]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Conditional Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Application/Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Service of Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.