U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10567
  • Case Name: Michael Howard and Sophia Howard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Wages]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amend Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Add Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.