U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-bk-10517
  • Case Name: Susan L. Mello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Conditional Order]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Continued-Bankruptcy]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Conditional Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.