U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10578
  • Case Name: Fouad S. Bakhos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Continued (Other)--Bankruptcy]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.