U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10602
  • Case Name: Rocco Stephen DeRosa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Terminate Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order to Show Cause in Writing Terminated]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Schedule of Post Petition Debts]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Show Cause in Writing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Post Conversion Report (Former Trustee Use)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Setting Post Conversion Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Utility -Convert Case Event]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(Attorney use only)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(Attorney use only)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Response]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Continued (Other)--Bankruptcy]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting Continued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.