U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10661
  • Case Name: Barbara A. Hodges-Santa Cruz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Supplement to Schedule I/J]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Required]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Debtor(s) Notice of Updated Creditor Address]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Continued (Other)--Bankruptcy]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting Continued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.