U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10657
  • Case Name: Hector Antonio Romero Lebron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Dismissing Case]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.