U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10618
  • Case Name: Christopher M Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Convert Case 13 to 7 (fee)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Supplement to Schedule I/J]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Vacate (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Vacate (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Application/Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Required]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.