U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Cotugno v. The Boppy Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 08, 2024: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.