U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10625
  • Case Name: Nicole A. Stillson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order to Show Cause in Writing Terminated]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Ch 7 Installment Payment for Efiled Case]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Show Cause in Writing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.