U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10598
  • Case Name: Joseph B. Jenness
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Wages]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 13 (Attorney use only)]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.