U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10728
  • Case Name: Charles J. Healy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Approve]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Approve (NOT for approving Loan Modifications through Court's Loss Mitigation Program)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Response]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Filing Fee]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.