U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10181
  • Case Name: John Z. Pytlarz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.