U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00346
  • Case Name: Doherty v. Rhode Island Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.