U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10674
  • Case Name: Ariel Espinal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [File Out of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Conditional Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Required]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.