U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00471
  • Case Name: J.E.L. et al v. Charest et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 11, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.