U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Perevoznikov v. Nessinger et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.