U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10062
  • Case Name: Robert M Connolly, Jr. and Ann L Connolly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Ch. 7 Trustee & Closing No Asset Case]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Debtor]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.