U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10164
  • Case Name: Angela G. Zambarano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Update Other Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Ch 7 Installment Payment for Efiled Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.