U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-bk-10097
  • Case Name: Denise E. Guy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Approve (NOT for approving Loan Modifications through Court's Loss Mitigation Program)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Required]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Authority]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.