U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10793
  • Case Name: Dorka Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Discharging Ch. 7 Trustee & Closing No Asset Case]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Service of Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Request Certified Copy]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Avoid Lien]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Avoid Lien (for Chs. 7, 11 and 12 only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.