U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10242
  • Case Name: Stephen B. Fonseca
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order to Show Cause in Writing Terminated]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Ch 7 Installment Payment for Efiled Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Show Cause in Writing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.